Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 11/15/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 11/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 11/21/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/16/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/26/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/26/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/01/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/25/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/29/2014