Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/19/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/19/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/19/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/19/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 12/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/19/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/17/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/24/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/20/2014