There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Tax Code Termination Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To terminate the Internal Revenue Code of 1986.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/23/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
01/23/2013Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2013Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2013Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E50)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (122)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/23/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/25/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/05/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/14/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 02/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/18/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 06/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/09/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/10/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/10/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/10/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/30/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/03/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/08/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/08/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/08/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/08/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/09/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/09/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/06/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/03/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/23/2013 Referred to
House Rules01/23/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.352.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.352. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/23/2013)

Tax Code Termination Act - Terminates the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 after December 31, 2017, except for self-employment taxes, Federal Insurance Contributions Act (FICA) taxes, and railroad retirement taxes. Requires a two-thirds majority vote in Congress to change such termination date.

Declares that any new federal tax system should be a simple and fair system that: (1) applies a low rate to all Americans, (2) provides tax relief for working Americans, (3) protects the rights of taxpayers and reduces tax collection abuses, (4) eliminates the bias against savings and investment, (5) promotes economic growth and job creation, and (6) does not penalize marriage or families.

Requires that the new federal tax system be approved by Congress in its final form by July 4, 2017.