Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 11/19/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 11/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 11/19/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/19/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/05/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/05/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/11/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/23/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/09/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/13/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/15/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 01/17/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/17/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/28/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/29/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/03/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/03/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/04/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/05/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/05/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/05/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/05/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/05/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/10/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/18/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/04/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 03/04/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/06/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/06/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/12/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/21/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/24/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/25/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/02/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/03/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/04/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/07/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/10/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/29/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/30/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/30/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 04/30/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/30/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/30/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/30/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/30/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/30/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/01/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/01/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/01/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/02/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/02/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/06/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/06/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/06/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/06/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/07/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/08/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/08/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/08/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/08/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/09/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/15/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/15/2014