Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 11/19/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/07/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/11/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/11/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/19/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/18/2014