Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 11/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/20/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/21/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/04/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 12/11/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/11/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/11/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 12/11/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/03/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/03/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/28/2014