There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Adoption Promotion Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title X of the Public Health Service Act with respect to adoption and other pregnancy options counseling.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/19/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/22/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/19/2013Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/21/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/21/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/21/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/05/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/10/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/03/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/07/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce11/19/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health11/22/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3539.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3539. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/19/2013)

Adoption Promotion Act of 2013 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to ensure that any pregnancy options counseling funded through training grants for personnel to carry out family planning service programs under such Act: (1) includes adoption counseling, and (2) is provided by individuals who are licensed social workers or counselors in the states in which they practice and who have knowledge and experience in adoption practice. Requires that any training provided to an individual with respect to family planning include training on the adoption process.

Requires research in the biomedical, contraceptive development, behavioral, and program implementation fields related to family planning and population funded under such Act to include: (1) the collection of data on the number of pregnancy tests administered to individuals served by family planning service programs and the results of those tests; and (2) the evaluation of the quality, consistency, and outcomes of pregnancy options counseling.