Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/04/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 01/07/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/13/2014