Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/20/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/04/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/09/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/04/2014