Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 11/20/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/20/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/16/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/14/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/18/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/18/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/05/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/25/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/29/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/13/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/13/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/13/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/26/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/03/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/03/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/10/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/09/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/14/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/18/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 11/18/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/18/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/18/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/18/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/04/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/10/2014