Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/14/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/18/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/05/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/25/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/13/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/26/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/14/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/18/2014