Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/20/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/05/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/06/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/06/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/11/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/12/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/12/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/12/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/24/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/26/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/03/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/09/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/09/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/28/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/28/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/12/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/24/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/24/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/09/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/14/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/17/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 07/31/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/31/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/11/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/11/2014