There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the extension of certain unemployment benefits, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/20/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
11/21/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/20/2013Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/2013Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (99)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 11/20/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/22/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 11/22/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/22/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/22/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/02/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/02/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/02/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/03/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 12/09/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 12/09/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/09/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 12/09/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 12/09/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 12/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/09/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/12/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 12/23/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/23/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/23/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/23/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 12/23/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/03/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/03/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 01/09/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 01/10/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/15/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/04/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/10/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/10/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/11/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/11/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/11/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/25/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/27/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 03/12/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/12/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/07/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/08/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means11/20/2013 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/20/2013 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials11/21/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3546. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/20/2013)

Emergency Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2013 - Amends the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 to extend emergency unemployment compensation (EUC) payments for eligible individuals to weeks of employment ending on or before January 1, 2015.

Amends the Assistance for Unemployed Workers and Struggling Families Act to extend until December 31, 2014, requirements that federal payments to states cover 100% of EUC.

Amends the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2008 to exempt weeks of unemployment between enactment of this Act and June 30, 2015, from the prohibition in the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970 (FSEUCA of 1970) against federal matching payments to a state for the first week in an individual's eligibility period for which extended compensation or sharable regular compensation is paid if the state law provides for payment of regular compensation to an individual for his or her first week of otherwise compensable unemployment. (Thus allows temporary federal matching for the first week of extended benefits for states with no waiting period.)

Amends the FSEUCA of 1970 to postpone similarly from December 31, 2013, to December 31, 2014, termination of the period during which a state may determine its "on" and "off" indicators according to specified temporary substitutions in its formula.

Amends the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 to appropriate funds out of the employment security administration account through FY2015 to assist states in providing reemployment and eligibility assessment activities.

Amends the Railroad Unemployment Insurance Act to extend through December 31, 2014, the temporary increase in extended unemployment benefits.