Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/09/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/11/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 03/12/2014