Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 12/23/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/15/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/08/2014