Refine your search

8 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
11/20/2013 Introduced in House
12/02/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 5 (Roll no. 612).(text: CR H7369)
12/12/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
01/15/2014 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the title and agree to the Senate amendment to the text with an amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 359 - 67 (Roll No. 21).
01/16/2014 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate concurred in the House amendment to the Senate amendment Yea-Nay Vote. 72 - 26. Record Vote Number: 13.(consideration: CR S425)
01/17/2014 Presented to President.
01/17/2014 Signed by President.
01/17/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-76.