Refine your search

52 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
01/17/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-76.
Type of Action: To President
01/17/2014 Signed by President.
Type of Action: To President
01/17/2014 House Presented to President.
01/17/2014 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014-6:30pm House Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 74, enrollment corrections on H.R. 3547 have been made.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate Senate concurred in the House amendment to the Senate amendment Yea-Nay Vote. 72 - 26. Record Vote Number: 13. (consideration: CR S425)
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
01/16/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2659 SA 2659 fell when SA 2658 fell. (consideration: CR S385)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2658 SA 2658 fell when SA 2657 fell. (consideration: CR S385)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2657 SA 2657 fell when cloture invoked on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR S385)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate Motion by Senator Reid to refer to Senate Committee on Appropriations the House message to accompany the bill with instructions to report back forthwith with amendment SA 2657 rendered moot when cloture was invoked on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment in Senate. (consideration: CR S385)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2656 SA 2656 fell when SA 2655 fell. (consideration: CR S385)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2655 SA 2655 fell when cloture invoked on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR S385)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate Motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment with amendment SA 2655 withdrawn. (consideration: CR S425)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate Cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 72 - 26. Record Vote Number: 12. (consideration: CR S424-425; text: CR S424-425)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2656 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S385)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2655 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S385)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2659 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S385)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2658 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S385)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2657 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S385)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S385-425)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2659 Amendment SA 2659 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 2658. (consideration: CR S361; text: CR S361)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2658 Amendment SA 2658 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 2657. (consideration: CR S360-361; text: CR S360)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2657 Amendment SA 2657 (the instructions to the motion) proposed by Senator Reid. (consideration: CR S360; text: CR S360)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014 Senate Motion by Senator Reid to refer to Senate Committee on Appropriations the House message to accompany the bill with instructions to report back forthwith with amendment SA 2657 made in Senate. (consideration: CR S360; text: CR S360)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2656 Amendment SA 2656 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 2655. (consideration: CR S360; text: CR S360)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2655 Amendment SA 2655 proposed by Senator Reid. (consideration: CR S360; text: CR S360)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014 Senate Motion by Senator Reid to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment with an amendment (SA 2655) made in Senate. (consideration: CR S360; text: CR S360)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014 Senate Cloture motion on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S360; text: CR S360)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014 Senate Motion by Senator Reid to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment made in Senate. (consideration: CR S360; text: CR S360)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S360-361)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014 Senate Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014-4:20pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
01/15/2014-4:20pm House On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the title and agree to the Senate amendment to the text with an amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 359 - 67 (Roll No. 21).
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
01/15/2014-3:51pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H451-452)
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
01/15/2014-2:35pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to H.Res. 458, the House proceeded with one hour of debate on the Rogers (KY) motion to concur in the Senate amendment to the title and to concur in the Senate amendment to the text of H.R. 3547 with an amendment consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 113-32, as modified by section 6 of H. Res. 458, in lieu of the matter proposed to be inserted by the Senate.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014-2:34pm House Mr. Rogers (KY) moved that the House agree with an amendment to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H255-452; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H256-437)
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
12/12/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/12/2013 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/12/2013 Senate S.Amdt.2545 Amendment SA 2545 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/12/2013 Senate S.Amdt.2545 Amendment SA 2545 proposed by Senator Nelson. (consideration: CR S8751; text: CR S8751)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/12/2013 Senate S.Amdt.2544 Amendment SA 2544 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/12/2013 Senate S.Amdt.2544 Amendment SA 2544 proposed by Senator Nelson. (consideration: CR S8751; text: CR S8751)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/12/2013 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8750-8751)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/09/2013 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
12/02/2013-7:04pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 5 (Roll no. 612). (text: CR H7369)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/02/2013-6:31pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7373-7374)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/02/2013-5:24pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/02/2013-5:03pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3547.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/02/2013-5:03pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7369-7371)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/02/2013-5:03pm House Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
11/20/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral