Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/29/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/06/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/28/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/20/2014