Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 11/20/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/21/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/22/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/16/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/29/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 01/29/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/29/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 01/29/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/30/2014