There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Humane Care for Primates Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a program to assist in the importation and care of abused, injured, or abandoned nonhuman primates.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/20/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/22/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/20/2013Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 12/03/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/03/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/03/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/03/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/05/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/05/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/08/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/03/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 02/03/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/10/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/10/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/10/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/26/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/26/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/26/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/11/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/18/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/18/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/19/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/29/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/12/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce11/20/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health11/22/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3556.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3556. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/20/2013)

Humane Care for Primates Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to promulgate a final rule revising federal regulations regarding the importation of nonhuman primates (i.e. chimpanzees, gorillas, orangutans, macaques, and numerous other species) to expand the categories of uses for which nonhuman primates may be imported and distributed to include live nonhuman primates imported into the United States by a certified primate sanctuary for purposes of providing lifetime shelter and care.

Requires such rule to establish a process for the certification of facilities as primate sanctuaries for purposes of the importation, shelter, and care of nonhuman primates.