Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 12/03/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 02/03/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/10/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/18/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/19/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/29/2014