Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/10/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/11/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/12/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/28/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/30/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/05/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/30/2014