Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/21/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/21/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 11/21/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/10/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/10/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/10/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/10/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/11/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/12/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/12/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/13/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 03/13/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/20/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/28/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/28/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/29/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/30/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/05/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/22/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/25/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/28/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/28/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/30/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/01/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2014