Refine your search

Showing 18 of 18 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
02/04/2014 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
02/03/2014-7:07pm House The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2014-7:07pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 0 (Roll no. 33). (text: CR H1520-1522)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2014-7:00pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1527-1528)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2014-5:47pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2014-5:15pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1520-1526)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2014-5:14pm House Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 66.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 113-94.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs
05/08/2013 House Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs
05/08/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs
04/25/2013 House Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/25/2013 House Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/10/2013 House Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
02/08/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs
01/23/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives