Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/14/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/16/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/08/2014