Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/08/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/08/2014