Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/05/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/05/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/28/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/08/2014