Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/08/2014