Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/04/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 12/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 12/04/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 12/04/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/12/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/12/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/19/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/19/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/08/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 01/08/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/14/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 01/14/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/05/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/05/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/05/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/05/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/26/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 02/26/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/26/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/28/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/28/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/05/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/05/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/12/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/28/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/28/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/28/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/23/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/23/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/23/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/16/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/16/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/08/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/08/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/08/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/08/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/08/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 12/08/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/08/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/08/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 12/08/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/08/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/08/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/08/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/08/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/08/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/08/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 12/08/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 12/08/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/08/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/08/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/08/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/08/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/08/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/08/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 12/08/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/08/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/08/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/08/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 12/08/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/08/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/08/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/08/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/08/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/08/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 12/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/08/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 12/08/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/08/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 12/08/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 12/08/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 12/08/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/10/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/10/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/10/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/10/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/10/2014