There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To establish requirements for the adoption of any new or revised requirement providing for the screening, testing, or treatment of an airman or an air traffic controller for a sleep disorder, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that any new or revised requirement providing for the screening, testing, or treatment of an airman or an air traffic controller for a sleep disorder is adopted pursuant to a rulemaking proceeding, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
02/11/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1744)
02/06/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-343.
11/21/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/12/2014SenateReceived in the Senate.
02/11/2014-5:38pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
02/11/2014-5:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1744)
02/11/2014-5:37pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1758)
02/11/2014-3:30pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. LoBiondo objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
02/11/2014-3:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3578.
02/11/2014-3:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1744-1746)
02/11/2014-3:14pmHouseMr. LoBiondo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/06/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 253.
02/06/2014HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-343.
12/04/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
12/04/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
12/04/2013HouseSubcommittee on Aviation Discharged.
11/22/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/21/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
11/21/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/22/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/02/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/02/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/03/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/03/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/03/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 12/03/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/04/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/09/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/09/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/09/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/19/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/07/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/07/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/07/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/13/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/17/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 01/17/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/17/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/17/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/28/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/29/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/29/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/06/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/06/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/21/2013 Referred to
12/04/2013 Markup by
02/06/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-343
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation11/22/2013 Referred to
12/04/2013 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3578. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (02/11/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on February 6, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the Secretary of Transportation (DOT), consistent with accepted medical standards and practices, to implement or enforce a requirement providing for the screening, testing, or treatment of airmen or air traffic controllers for sleep disorders (including obstructive sleep apnea) only if: (1) it is adopted pursuant to a rulemaking proceeding in the case of an airman, and (2) the Federal Aviation Administration meets its collective bargaining obligations to its employees in the case of an air traffic controller.

Applies this Act only to a requirement adopted on or after November 1, 2013.