Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/22/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/02/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/02/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/03/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/03/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/03/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 12/03/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/04/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/09/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/09/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/09/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/19/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/07/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/07/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/07/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/13/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/17/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 01/17/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/17/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/17/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/28/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/29/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/29/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/06/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/06/2014