Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/22/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 12/12/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/12/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/12/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 12/16/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/20/2014
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/08/2014