Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/25/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/18/2013