Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/21/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/18/2013