Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/28/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/10/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/01/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/09/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/24/2014