Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/23/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/26/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/26/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/27/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/02/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/02/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/03/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/18/2014