Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/27/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 01/27/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/03/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/04/2014