Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/12/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/07/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/10/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/03/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 02/03/2014