Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/10/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/13/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/27/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/03/2014