Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/28/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/17/2014