Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/19/2013