Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 01/23/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/23/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 01/23/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/23/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/23/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/01/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/01/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/01/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/01/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/13/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/13/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/13/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/13/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/04/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/04/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/13/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/13/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/13/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/13/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/18/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 03/18/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/18/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/26/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/14/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/14/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/14/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/27/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/27/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/23/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 05/07/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/23/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/09/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/10/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 06/20/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 06/20/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/25/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 07/23/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/29/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/10/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/11/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/15/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/12/2014