Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
05/24/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-11. (TXT | PDF)
05/24/2013 Signed by President.
05/15/2013 Presented to President.
05/09/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3351-3352)
04/24/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 0 (Roll no. 123).(text: CR H2261)
01/23/2013 Introduced in House