Refine your search

Refined by:

Arizona Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/05/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/14/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/15/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/20/2013