Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/14/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 02/14/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/14/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/14/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/13/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/13/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 03/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/14/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/20/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/20/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 03/20/2013