Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/05/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/05/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/05/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/14/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/06/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/14/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/15/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/15/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/20/2013