Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/05/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 02/15/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/20/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/20/2013