Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/14/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/15/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/15/2013