Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/14/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/25/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/14/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/15/2013