Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 03/20/2013